EP4086791 - RESPONSE DEVICE, RESPONSE SYSTEM, RESPONSE METHOD, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku 108-8001 Tokyo / JP | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWASE, Nobuaki Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
IGARASHI, Makoto Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 22176701.5 | 08.06.2017 | [2022/45] | Priority number, date | JP20160117396 | 13.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016117396 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4086791 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, B25J11/00 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
B25J11/0005 (EP,US);
G06F16/00 (US);
G06F16/24 (US);
G06F16/90335 (US);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06T7/00 (EP,US);
G06V10/751 (US);
G06V40/161 (US);
G06V40/168 (US);
G06V40/172 (US);
G06V40/50 (US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06F3/16 (US);
G06V40/178 (US);
G10L13/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] |
Former [2022/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTWORTVORRICHTUNG, ANTWORTSYSTEM, ANTWORTVERFAHREN UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2022/45] | English: | RESPONSE DEVICE, RESPONSE SYSTEM, RESPONSE METHOD, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2022/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉPONSE, SYSTÈME DE RÉPONSE, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPONSE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 09.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17813212.2 / EP3418912 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2004101901 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0036] - [0 46] , [0051] - [0061] *; | [A]US2004215463 (AOYAMA KAZUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0054] , [0085] - [0114]; figures 6-12 *; | [Y]US2011257985 (GOLDSTEIN BORIS [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0018] , [0024] , [0028] , [0031] , [0043] , [0049] - [0051] - [0056] - [0057] * | by applicant | WO2015093382 | JP2016117396 |