EP4044173 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TEXT TO SPEECH, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apollo Intelligent Connectivity (Beijing) Technology Co., Ltd. 101, 1st floor, building 1, yard 7 Ruihe West 2nd Road Beijing Economic and Technological Development Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhou, Yi Beijing, 100176 / CN | 02 /
Chen, Zhen Beijing, 100176 / CN | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/42] |
Former [2022/33] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22176933.4 | 02.06.2022 | [2022/33] | Priority number, date | CN202110639016 | 08.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110639016 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4044173 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4044173 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4044173 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/04, G06F3/16, // G10L13/033 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
G10L13/04 (EP,CN,US);
G10L13/02 (CN,KR,US);
G06F16/638 (CN,KR);
G06F3/165 (EP);
G06F9/4881 (CN,KR);
G10L13/033 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | G10L13/04, G06F3/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] |
Former [2022/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR TEXT-ZU-SPRACHE, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TEXT TO SPEECH, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONVERSION DE TEXTE EN PAROLE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/33] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 11.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | IT | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007094029 (SAITO NATSUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XA]US2014336919 (LI WEIYING [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0092] , [0 93] , [0161] , [ 166]; figures 3,4 * [A] 3,9; | [A]US2018011680 (AIST GREGORY S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0076] , [0077] * | Examination | WO2017213691 |