EP4285793 - METHOD AND VAPOUR SEPARATOR FOR SEPARATING STEAM FROM A LIQUID GAS MIXTURE, HOT WATER DISPENSER, METHOD FOR CLEANING A STEAM SEPARATOR, USE OF A STEAM SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JURA ELEKTROAPPARATE AG Kaffeeweltstrasse 10 4626 Niederbuchsiten / CH | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Probst, Stephan 4573 Lohn-Ammannsegg / CH | 02 /
Baltensperger, Samuel 5420 Ehrendingen / CH | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Mertzlufft-Paufler, Cornelius, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22177210.6 | 03.06.2022 | [2023/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4285793 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/46, A47J31/60, A47J31/44 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A47J31/60 (EP);
A47J31/4489 (EP);
A47J31/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2023/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND DAMPFABSCHEIDER ZUM DAMPFABSCHEIDEN AUS EINEM FLÜSSIG-GAS-GEMISCH, HEISSWASSERSPENDER, VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINES DAMPFABSCHEIDERS, VERWENDUNG EINES DAMPFABSCHEIDERS | [2023/49] | English: | METHOD AND VAPOUR SEPARATOR FOR SEPARATING STEAM FROM A LIQUID GAS MIXTURE, HOT WATER DISPENSER, METHOD FOR CLEANING A STEAM SEPARATOR, USE OF A STEAM SEPARATOR | [2023/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SÉPARATEUR DE VAPEUR PERMETTANT DE SÉPARER LA VAPEUR D'UN MÉLANGE LIQUIDE-GAZ, DISTRIBUTEUR D'EAU CHAUDE, PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE D'UN SÉPARATEUR DE VAPEUR, UTILISATION D'UN SÉPARATEUR DE VAPEUR | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 14.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2353473 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 4,24 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN108793300 (FOSHAN SHUNDE MIDEA WATER DISPENSER MFG CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-25* paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0090]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]CN109259605 (GUANGZHOU LOHAS ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION TECH CO LTD) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0044]; figure 1 *; | [XYI]CN108392082B (LIU MENGHUI) [X] 1,6-8,10-12,16,21-23,25 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,9,24 [I] 2,3,5,13-15,17-20 |