EP4101766 - AIRCRAFT SEAT COMPRISING AN ADJUSTABLE BACKREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Expliseat 20 rue Bouvier 75011 Paris / FR | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAADA, Benjamin 75005 PARIS / FR | 02 /
LAUNAY, Julie 94210 SAINT-MAUR-DES-FOSSES / FR | 03 /
TEJEDOR, Vincent 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/14] |
Former [2022/50] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22177288.2 | 03.06.2022 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | FR20210006038 | 08.06.2021 Original published format: FR 2106038 | [2022/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101766 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4101766 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/06, B60N2/015, B60N2/22 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
B64D11/064 (EP);
B60N2/015 (EP);
B60N2/224 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2022/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LUFTFAHRZEUGSITZ MIT EINER VERSTELLBAREN RÜCKENLEHNE | [2022/50] | English: | AIRCRAFT SEAT COMPRISING AN ADJUSTABLE BACKREST | [2022/50] | French: | SIÈGE D'AÉRONEF COMPRENANT UN DOSSIER AJUSTABLE | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 12.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1947007 (RECARO AIRCRAFT SEATING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7* figure 2 *; | [A]DE102010033752 (RECARO AIRCRAFT SEATING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029]; figure 2 * |