EP4108549 - VEHICLE FRONT SECTION STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARA, Yasuhiro TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KOREISHI, Norimasa TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Jumpei TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
ISHIOKA, Hirotaka TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 22177696.6 | 07.06.2022 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | JP20210103516 | 22.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021103516 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4108549 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15, B62D25/08, B62D21/02, B62D25/20, B62D33/06, B62D47/02 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
B62D21/02 (EP,CN);
B62D25/08 (CN,US);
B62D21/152 (EP,CN,US);
B62D21/11 (US);
B62D25/04 (US);
B62D25/082 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBAU EINES FAHRZEUGFRONTTEILS | [2022/52] | English: | VEHICLE FRONT SECTION STRUCTURE | [2022/52] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SECTION AVANT DE VÉHICULE | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 01.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10175563 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [A] 1-12* figure 5 *; | [XA]JPH10316013 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [X] 1,12 * figures 5,9 * [A] 2-11; | [XAI]JP2005067268 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD) [X] 1,4,7-9,12 * figure 1a * [A] 2,3 [I] 5,6,10,11; | [XAI]WO2006111311 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,12 * figures 1,10 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] * [A] 4-11 [I] 3; | [A]WO2019219179 (EDAG ENG GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1, 10 * | by applicant | JPS62139787 |