EP4109114 - SENSOR UNIT FOR HIGHLY SENSITIVE MEASUREMENT OF CURRENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W & S Technik GmbH Herner Strasse 130 44575 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kühnhold, Dennis 59192 Bergkamen / DE | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 22178698.1 | 13.06.2022 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | DE202110116112 | 22.06.2021 Original published format: DE102021116112 | [2022/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109114 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/20 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G01R15/207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSOREINHEIT ZUR HOCHEMPFINDLICHEN MESSUNG VON STRÖMEN | [2022/52] | English: | SENSOR UNIT FOR HIGHLY SENSITIVE MEASUREMENT OF CURRENTS | [2022/52] | French: | UNITÉ DE CAPTEUR DESTINÉE À LA MESURE HAUTEMENT SENSIBLE DES COURANTS | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 08.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1772737 (SENTRON AG [CH]); | [Y]US2007090825 (SHOJI SHIGERU [JP]); | [A]DE202008012593U (STANKOWITZ TEST EQUIPMENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2010231198 (BOSE SANJAY [US], et al); | [Y]DE202012103071U (RAUSCHERT HEINERSDORF PRESSIG GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE202012103071U |