EP4102705 - PROTECTION CIRCUITRY FOR POWER CONVERTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Bo Vernon, CT / US | 02 /
LEE, Yongduk Vernon, CT / US | 03 /
WU, Xin Glastonbury, CT / US | 04 /
DWARI, Suman East Hartford, CT / US | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 22178766.6 | 13.06.2022 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | US202117345548 | 11.06.2021 Original published format: US202117345548 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102705 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/32, H02M7/487 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
H02M7/217 (US);
H02M7/487 (EP);
H02M7/537 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2022/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZSCHALTUNG FÜR LEISTUNGSWANDLER | [2022/50] | English: | PROTECTION CIRCUITRY FOR POWER CONVERTERS | [2022/50] | French: | CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION POUR CONVERTISSEURS DE PUISSANCE | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 14.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6392907 (ICHIKAWA KOSAKU [JP]) [A] 1-13 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2017214335 (BASIC DURO [DE], et al) [A] 1-13* figure 1 *; | [XI]US2018034362 (KUBOUCHI MOTOYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12 * figure 10 * * paragraph [0194] * * paragraph [0206] - paragraph [0217] * [I] 10,13 |