EP4293057 - POLYMER FOR INHIBITING SARS-COV-2 AND OTHER PATHOGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freie Universität Berlin Kaiserswerther Straße 16-18 14195 Berlin / DE | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAG, Rainer 12209 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BEJ, Raju 14129 Berlin / DE | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22178893.8 | 14.06.2022 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293057 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/28, C08F220/58, A61K9/00, A61K31/78, A61P31/14, A61P31/20, C08F293/00, C08F8/36 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61K31/78 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
C08F220/282 (EP);
C08F220/58 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/282, C08F220/346 (EP);
C08F220/58, C08F220/346 (EP);
C08F8/36, C08F220/282 (EP);
C08F8/36, C08F220/54 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMER ZUM HEMMEN VON SARS-COV-2 UND ANDEREN PATHOGENEN | [2023/51] | English: | POLYMER FOR INHIBITING SARS-COV-2 AND OTHER PATHOGENS | [2023/51] | French: | POLYMÈRE D'INHIBITION DU SARS-COV-2 ET D'AUTRES AGENTS PATHOGÈNES | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2021198139 (ECOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FED LAUSANNE EPFL [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, lines 4-9 * * page 2, line 23 - page 6, line 8 * * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 17 * * examples 1-6 *; | [A]WO2021234414 (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0021] - [0036] - [0096] - [0139] - [0156] * * examples 1-10; tables A-C *; | [AD] - Nie Chuanxiong ET AL, "Polysulfates Block SARS-CoV-2 Uptakethrough Electrostatic Interactions**", (20210609), pages 15870 - 15878, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/anie.202102717, (20221128), XP093002495 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * results and discussion;; figures 1-5; tables 1,2 * | [AD] - PAIARDI GIULIA ET AL, "The binding of heparin to spike glycoprotein inhibits SARS-CoV-2 infection by three mechanisms", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US, vol. 298, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.jbc.2021.101507, ISSN 0021-9258, (20211218), page 101507, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC8683219/pdf/main.pdf, (20221128), XP093002964 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * results and discussion;; figures 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbc.2021.101507 | by applicant | US10392474 | - ZANIN, M.BAVISKAR, P.WEBSTER, R.WEBBY, R, Cell Host Microbe, (20160000), vol. 19, pages 159 - 168 | - WERLANG, C.CARCARMO-OYARCE, G.RIBBECK, K, Nat. Rev. Mater., (20190000), vol. 4, pages 134 - 145 | - RIDLEY, C.THORNTON, D. J, Biochem. Soc. Trans., (20180000), vol. 46, pages 1099 - 1106 | - WHEELER, K. M.CARCAMO-OYARCE, G.TURNER, B. S.DELLOS-NOLAN, S.CO1, J. Y.LEHOUX, S.CUMMINGS, R. D.WOZNIAK, D J.RIBBECK, K, Nat. Microbiol., (20190000), vol. 4, pages 2146 - 2154 | - LIELEG, O.LIELEG, C.BLOOM, J.BUCK, C. B.RIBBECK, K, Biomacromolecules, (20120000), vol. 13, pages 1724 - 1732 | - WARDZALA, C. L.WOOD, A. M.BELNAP, D. MKRAMER, J. R., ACS Cent. Sci., (20220000), vol. 8, pages 351 - 360 | - SONG, D.IVERSON, E.KALER, L.BADER, SSCULL, M. A.DUNCAN, G. A, ACS Biomater. Sci. Eng., (20210000), vol. 7, pages 2723 - 2733 | - THORNTON, D. J.SHEEHAN, J. K, Proc. Am. Thorac. Soc., (20040000), vol. 1, pages 54 - 61 | - AUTHIMOOLAM, S. P.DZIUBLA, T. D, Polymers, (20160000), vol. 8, page 71 | - JAVITT, GKHMELNITSKY, L.ALBERT, L.BIGMAN, L. S.ELAD, N.MORGENSTERN, D.ILANI, TLEVY, Y.DISKIN, R.FASS, D, Cell, (20200000), vol. 183, pages 717 - 729 | - RABUKA, D.PARTHASARATHY, R.LEE, G. S.CHEN, X.GROVES, J. T.BERTOZZI, C. R., J. Am. Chem., (20070000), vol. 129, pages 5462 - 5471 | - KRUGER, A. G.BRUCKS, S. D.YAN, T.CARCARMO-OYARCE, G.WEI, Y.WEN, D. H.CARVALHO, D. RHORE, M. J. A.RIBBECK, K.SCHROCK, R. R., ACS Cent. Sci., (20210000), vol. 7, pages 624 - 630 | - KWAN, C.-SCERULLO, A. R.BRAUNSCHWEIG, A. B, ChemPlusChem, (20200000), vol. 85, pages 2704 - 2721 | - KRAMER, J. R.ONOA, BBUSTAMANTE, C.BERTOZZI, C. R, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U. S. A., (20150000), vol. 112, pages 12574 - 12579 | - COHEN, M.SENAATI, H. P.FISHER, C. J.HUANG, M. L.GAGNEUX, P.GODULA, K, ACS Cent. Sci., (20160000), vol. 2, pages 710 - 714 | - WALLERT, M.NIE, C.ANILKUMAR, P.ABBINA, S.BHATIA, SLUDWIG, K.KIZHAKKEDATHU, J. N.HAAG, R.BLOCK, S, Small, (20200000), vol. 16, page 2004635 | - M. CALDERONM. A. QUADIRS. K. SHARMAR. HAAG, Adv. Mater., (20100000), vol. 22, pages 190 - 218 | - YE, T.ZHONG, Z.GARCIA-SASTRE, A.SCHOTSAERT, M, Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20200000), vol. 59, pages 18885 - 18897 | - A. LUTTENSH. GULLBERGE. ABDURAKHMANOVD. D. VOD. AKABERIV. O. TALIBOVN. NEKHOTIAEVAL. VANGEELS. DE JONGHED. JOCHMANS, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20220000), vol. 144, no. 7, pages 2905 - 2920 | - LARUE, R. C.XING, EKENNEY, A. D.ZHANG, Y.TUAZON, J. A.LI, J.YOUNT, J. S.LI, P.-K.SHARMA, A, Bioconjugate Chem, (20210000), vol. 32, pages 215 - 223 | - T. M. CLAUSEND. R. SANDOVALC. B. SPLIIDJ. PIHLH. R. PERRETTC. D. PAINTERA. NARAYANANS. A. MAJOWICZE. M. KWONGR. N. MCVICAR, Cell, vol. 183, pages 1043 - 1057 | - NIE, C.POUYAN, P.LAUSTER, D.TRIMPERT, J.KERKHOFF, Y.SZEKERES, G. P.WALLERT, M.BLOCK, S.SAHOO, A. K.DERNEDDE et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20210000), vol. 60, pages 15870 - 15878 | - DONSKYI, I. SNIE, C.KAI LUDWIGJAKOB TRIMPERTRAMEEZ AHMEDELISA QUAAKATHARINA ACHAZIJORG RADNIKMOHSEN ADELIRAINER HAAG, Small, (20210000), vol. 17, page 2007091 | - E. MOHAMMADIFARV. AHMADIM. FARDIN GHOLAMIA. OEHRLO. KOLYVUSHKOC. NIEI. S. DONSKYIS. HERZIGERJ. RADNIKK. LUDWIG, Adv. Funct. Mater, (20210000), vol. 31, page 2009003 | - R. BEJP. RAJDEVR. BARMANS. GHOSH, Polym. Chem., (20200000), vol. 11, page 990 | - F. PAULUSD. STEINHILBERP. WELKERD. MANGOLDTK. LICHAH. DEPNERS. SIGRISTR. HAAG, Polym, (20140000), vol. 5, page 5020 | - Y. YAMAUCHIN, N. HORIMOTOK. YAMADAY. MATSUSHITAM. TAKEUCHIY. ISHIDA, Angew. Chem., (20210000), vol. 60, pages 1528 - 1534 | - J. VONNEMANN, S. LIESE, C. KUEHNE, K. LUDWIG, J. DERNEDDE, C. BOTTCHER, R. R. NETZ, R. HAAG, Am. Chem. Soc., (20150000), vol. 137, pages 2572 - 2579 | - C. NIEA. K. SAHOOR. R. NETZA. HERMANNM. BALLAUFFR. HAAG, ChemBioChem, (20220000), vol. 23, page e2021006 | - LEAL, J.SMYTH, H. D. C.GHOSH, D, Int. J. Pharm., (20170000), vol. 532, pages 555 - 572 | - POUYAN, P.; NIE, C.; BHATIA, S.; WEDEPOHL, S.; ACHAZI, K.; OSTERRIEDER, N.; HAAG, R, Biomacromolecules, (20210000), vol. 22, pages 1545 - 1554 | - T. CROUZIERK. BOETTCHERA. R. GEONNOTTIN. L. KAVANAUGHJ. B. HIRSCHK. RIBBECKO. LIELEG, Adv. Mater. Interfaces, (20150000), vol. 2, page 1500308 | - PETROU, G.; CROUZIER, Biomater. Sci., (20180000), vol. 6, pages 2282 - 2297 | - COOK, M. TSMITH, S. L.KHUTORYANSKIY, V. V., Chem. Commun., (20150000), vol. 51, pages 14447 - 14450 | - MARCZYNSKI, M.KIMNA, C.LIELEG, O, Adv. Drug Deliv. Rev., (20210000), vol. 178, page 113845 | - S. Y. KIM, W. JIN, A. SOOD, D. W. MONTGOMERY, O. C. GRANT, M. M. FUSTER, L. FU, J. S. DORDICK, R. J. WOODS, F. ZHANG, R. J. LINHARDT, Antiviral Res., (20200000), vol. 181, page 104873 | - O. ALFII. FROMA. YAKIREVITCHM. DRENDELM. WOLFK. MEIRZ. ZAKAY-RONESY. NEVOS. ELGAVISHO. ILAN, J. Virol., (20200000), vol. 94, pages e01258 - 20 | - G. GUNKELM. WEINHARTT. BECHERERR. HAAGW. T. S. HUCK, Biomacromolecules, (20110000), vol. 12, pages 4169 - 4172 | - P. DEYP. RAJDEVP. PRAMANIKR. HAAGS. GHOSH, Macromolecules, (20200000), vol. 53, pages 7044 - 7052 |