EP4079385 - THIN FILM TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aurotec GmbH Seestraße 11 4844 Regau / AT | For all designated states Buss-SMS-Canzler GmbH Hohenrainstrasse 10 4133 Pratteln / CH | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIKELI, Stefan 4844 Regau / AT | 02 /
KITZLER, Hannes 4850 Timelkam / AT | 03 /
ZAUNER, Philipp 4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | 04 /
AIGNER, Paul 4860 Lenzing / AT | 05 /
LONGIN, Michael 8983 Bad Mitterndorf / AT | 06 /
NAEF, Rainer 8953 Dietikon / AT | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | SONN Patentanwälte OG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 22178959.7 | 12.06.2020 | [2022/43] | Priority number, date | EP20190179678 | 12.06.2019 Original published format: EP 19179678 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079385 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D1/00, B01D1/22 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B01D1/228 (EP,KR,US);
B01D1/225 (EP,KR);
B01D1/22 (CN);
B01D1/0082 (EP,KR,US);
B01D1/226 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/1887 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] |
Former [2022/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÜNNSCHICHTBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/43] | English: | THIN FILM TREATMENT DEVICE | [2022/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DES COUCHES MINCES | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 26.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20731131.7 / EP3983102 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO9406530 (COURTAULDS FIBRES LTD [GB]); | [XI]US5656224 (ZIKELI STEFAN [AT], et al); | [XI]US5888288 (QUIGLEY MICHAEL [GB], et al) | by applicant | EP0356419 | WO9311396 | WO9406530 | DE4441468 | DE10050997 | WO03029329 | WO2004041420 | WO2006000197 | WO2007076979 | WO2008154668 | WO2013030399 | WO2013156489 | DE19914117630 |