EP4134015 - RETAINER ASSEMBLEY INCLUDING A TISSUE THICKNESS COMPENSATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAXTER, III Chester O. Loveland, 45140 / US | 02 /
SHELTON, IV Frederick E. Hillsboro, 45133 / US | 03 /
SCHMID, Katherine J. Cincinnati, 45241 / US | 04 /
MORGAN, Jerome R. Cincinnati, 45236 / US | 05 /
SCHEIB, Charles J. Loveland, 45140 / US | 06 /
CROPPER, Michael S. Edgewood, 41017 / US | 07 /
ARONHALT, Taylor W. Loveland, 45140 / US | 08 /
HALL, Steven G. Cincinnati, 45242 / US | 09 /
TIMM, Richard W. Cincinnati, 45209 / US | 10 /
LANG, Matthew M. Mason, 45040 / US | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 22179028.0 | 27.03.2013 | [2023/07] | Priority number, date | US201213433114 | 28.03.2012 Original published format: US201213433114 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4134015 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, A61B17/00, A61B17/115, A61B17/064, // A61B17/29, A61B17/32 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/00491 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61B17/105 (US);
A61B17/0643 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61B17/0644 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B17/072 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/07292 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/1155 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/2909 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00495 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0053 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00818 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00884 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00893 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/07228 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/07235 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/07242 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0725 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/07264 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/07285 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2908 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2919 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2923 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2933 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2936 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/320052 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] |
Former [2023/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HALTERANORDNUNG MIT EINEM GEWEBEDICKENAUSGLEICHER | [2023/07] | English: | RETAINER ASSEMBLEY INCLUDING A TISSUE THICKNESS COMPENSATOR | [2023/07] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE RETENUE COMPRENANT UN COMPENSATEUR D'ÉPAISSEUR DE TISSU | [2023/07] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 11.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13161472.9 / EP2644120 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9945849 (SHELHIGH INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * figures 16-19 * * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 6 *; | [A]EP0993274 (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-12 ** paragraphs [0028] - [0082] *; | [A]EP2090231 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * figures 38-61 * * paragraphs [0051] - [0066] * | by applicant | US5285945 | US5468253 | US6325810 | US7083075 | US7380696 | US7780685 | US20060541123 | US20070441632 | US20080031817 | US20100894311 | US20100894340 | US20100894327 | US20100894351 | US20100894338 | US20100894369 | US20100894312 | US20100894377 | US20100894339 | US20100894360 | US20100894322 | US20100894350 | US20100894383 | US20100894389 | US20100894345 | US20100894306 | US20100894318 | US20100894330 | US20100894361 | US20100894367 | US20100894388 | US20100894376 |