EP4293148 - NONWOVEN LAYER COMPRISING A NETWORK OF SUBSTANTIALLY CONTINUOUS REGENERATED CELLULOSIC FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LENZING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werkstrasse 2 4860 Lenzing / AT | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köll, Berndt 4810 Gmunden / AT | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Global Patent Management Lenzing AG Werkstraße 2 4860 Lenzing / AT | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22179266.6 | 15.06.2022 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293148 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/013, G01N33/543 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
D04H3/013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VLIESSTOFFSCHICHT MIT EINEM NETZWERK AUS IM WESENTLICHEN ENDLOSEN REGENERIERTEN ZELLULOSEFASERN | [2023/51] | English: | NONWOVEN LAYER COMPRISING A NETWORK OF SUBSTANTIALLY CONTINUOUS REGENERATED CELLULOSIC FIBERS | [2023/51] | French: | COUCHE NON TISSÉE COMPRENANT UN RÉSEAU DE FIBRES CELLULOSIQUES RÉGÉNÉRÉES SENSIBLEMENT CONTINUES | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2017215284 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] ** paragraph [0060] *; | [XDA]WO2018184038 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) [XD] 1-10 * page 2, line 19 - line 30 * * page 6, line 11 - line 32 * * page 13, line 16 - page 16, line 12; examples 1, 2; tables 1, 2 * [A] 11-13 | by applicant | EP1093536 | WO2007124521 | EP2212456 | EP2013390 | WO2018071928 | WO2018184941 | WO2018184038 | WO2018184932 | WO2020016296 | - DODSON, C.T.J.HANDLEY, AMOBA, YSAMPSON, W, "The pore radius distribution in paper. Part I: The effect of formation and grammage", Appita Journal, (20020000), vol. 56 |