EP4294011 - METHOD FOR IMAGE ENCODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MBDA UK Limited Six Hills Way Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2DA / GB | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22179466.2 | 16.06.2022 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4294011 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/60, H04N19/66, H04N19/88 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H04N19/60 (EP);
H04N19/66 (EP);
H04N19/88 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDCODIERUNG | [2023/51] | English: | METHOD FOR IMAGE ENCODING | [2023/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGE | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - PHILIP A CHOU ET AL, Multimedia over IP and Wireless Networks: Compression, Networking, and Systems, MULTIMEDIA OVER IP AND WIRELESS NETWORKS: COMPRESSION, NETWORKING, AND SYSTEMS, ACADEMIC PRESS, NL, PAGE(S) 1 - 712, (20070330), ISBN 978-0-12-088480-3, XP040425641 [X] 1,2,7,12 * paragraph [2.2.1] * * paragraph [2.3.1] * * paragraph [2.3.4] - paragraph [2.4.3] * * paragraph [7.3.3] * [I] 1-12 | [A] - "Introduction of CR for downlink DVRB mapping to PRB", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-081818, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080514), vol. RAN WG1, no. Kansas City, USA; 20080514, XP050110194 [A] 3 * the whole document * | [A] - BROADCOM, "Text proposal on Rate matching for TS36.212", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-073411_TEXT_PROPOSAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070815), vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20070815, XP050107027 [A] 3 * the whole document * | by applicant | - "Cubic convolution interpolation for digital image processing", IEEE Transactions on Acoustics, Speech, and Signal Processing, vol. 29, no. 6, pages 1153 - 1160 | - JIE LIANG et al., "Approximating the DCT with the lifting scheme: systematic design and applications", Conference Record of the Thirty-Fourth Asilomar Conference on Signals, Systems and Computers, (20000000), vol. 1, pages 192 - 196 | - D. W. REDMILLN. G. KINGSBURY, "The EREC: an error-resilient technique for coding variable length blocks of data", IEEE Transactions on Image Processing, (19960400), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 565 - 574 | - R. CHANDRAMOULIN. RANGAHATHANS. J. RAMADOS, "Adaptive quantization and fast error-resilient entropy coding for image transmission", IEEE Transactions on Circuits and Systems for Video Technology, (19980800), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 411 - 421 |