EP4123185 - AXIAL FAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Denki Co., Ltd. 33-1, Minamiotsuka 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8451 / JP | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Yoshihisa Tokyo, 170-8451 / JP | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 22179862.2 | 20.06.2022 | [2023/04] | Priority number, date | JP20210119448 | 20.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021119448 | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4123185 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/32, F04D29/38 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
F04D29/325 (EP,US);
F04D29/384 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] |
Former [2023/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AXIALLÜFTER | [2023/04] | English: | AXIAL FAN | [2023/04] | French: | VENTILATEUR AXIAL | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 17.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010266428 (NAKAGAWA SUGURU [JP], et al); | [X]WO2013154100 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [XY]WO2019150567 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JPS595985B |