EP4109738 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF TRAJECTORY SHAPING FOR FEASIBLE MOTION COMMANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124-6188 / US | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffman, Jonathan D. Mayfield Heights, OH, 44124 / US | 02 /
Fast, Brian Mayfield Heights, OH, 44124 / US | 03 /
Miklosovic, Robert J. Mayfield Heights, OH, 44124 / US | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 22180207.7 | 21.06.2022 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | US202117352792 | 21.06.2021 Original published format: US202117352792 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109738 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02P23/20 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H02P23/20 (EP,CN);
H02P6/08 (CN);
H02P29/024 (US);
H02P23/12 (CN);
H02P23/14 (CN);
H02P29/10 (US);
H02P29/40 (US);
H02P6/16 (CN);
H02P6/28 (CN);
H02P2205/01 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BAHNFORMUNG FÜR MACHBARE BEWEGUNGSBEFEHLE | [2022/52] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF TRAJECTORY SHAPING FOR FEASIBLE MOTION COMMANDS | [2022/52] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN FORME DE TRAJECTOIRE DE COMMANDES DE MOUVEMENT POSSIBLES | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 28.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2270998 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]EP2031363 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2018262144 (MIKLOSOVIC ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1,5 * |