EP4296190 - HOLDER FOR LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schulz, Joachim Dorfstr. 47 14806 Planetal OT Mörz / DE | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22180833.0 | 23.06.2022 | [2023/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4296190 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/06, B65D77/28 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
B65D77/286 (EP);
B65D77/068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2023/52] | English: | HOLDER FOR LIQUIDS | [2023/52] | French: | RÉCIPIENT POUR LIQUIDES | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2097761 (WU SHING SHAN) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-10 * [I] 10-12; | [XYI]WO8604314 (MASUNO YOSHIAKI) [X] 1-5,10-12 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1-15 * [Y] 6-9,14 [I] 13; | [X]US5495982 (WANG MEIN-AING [TW]) [X] 1,10 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2007029334 (BAGLEY PERRY S [US]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-14 *; | [Y]WO2010062247 (ERIKSSON VILHO [SE]) [Y] 6-9,14* pages 9-17; figures 1-17 *; | [X]CN210012102U (UNION HOSPITAL TONGJI MEDICAL COLLEGE HUAZHONG UNIV SCI & TECH) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-3 * |