EP4144784 - A METHOD FOR MAKING A LIGNIN COMPONENT, A LIGNIN COMPONENT AND ITS USE AND A PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene Corporation Alvar Aallon katu 1 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miettinen, Mauno 53600 Lappeenranta / FI | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 22181247.2 | 05.12.2012 | [2023/10] | Priority number, date | FI20110006253 | 09.12.2011 Original published format: FI 20116253 | FI20120005703 | 25.06.2012 Original published format: FI 20125703 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144784 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08H7/00, C08H8/00, C08L97/00 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
C08H6/00 (EP,US);
C07G1/00 (US);
C08H8/00 (EP,US);
C08L97/005 (EP,US);
D21C1/04 (EP,US);
D21C3/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LIGNINKOMPONENTE, LIGNINKOMPONENTE, IHRE ANWENDUNG UND PRODUKT | [2023/10] | English: | A METHOD FOR MAKING A LIGNIN COMPONENT, A LIGNIN COMPONENT AND ITS USE AND A PRODUCT | [2023/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT DE LIGNINE, COMPOSANT DE LIGNINE ET SON UTILISATION, ET PRODUIT | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/08] | 06.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12813388.1 / EP2788404 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0364632 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1,3-15 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 26 * * column 3, lines 17-56 * * example 1 * [Y] 1,2; | [XY]US2004244925 (TARASENKO DAVID [CA]) [X] 1-3,5-15 * paragraph [0013] * * Tables 2 and 3, Trials 8 and 9 * * Tables 2 and 3, Trials 8 and 9; paragraphs [0013] , [0 71] * [Y] 1-12; | [XDY]WO2006031175 (STFI PACKFORSK AB [SE], et al) [XD] 13-15 * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 20 * * page 3, lines 12-31 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 32 * * example 3 *[Y] 1-12 | by applicant | WO2006031175 | FI20116253 | FI20125703 | WO2011FI50896 |