EP4113081 - ASSEMBLY FOR MEASURING THE TEMPERATURE OF A SURFACE OF AN OBJECT DURING THE PERFORMANCE OF A HEAT TREATMENT, ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR HEAT TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Framatome 1 place Jean Millier Tour Areva 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOURGUES CODERN, Alejandro 71670 LE BREUIL / FR | 02 /
SEIXAS, Mario 71450 BLANZY / FR | 03 /
MENELET, Kewin 71240 VARENNES LE GRAND / FR | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 22182001.2 | 29.06.2022 | [2023/01] | Priority number, date | FR20210007042 | 30.06.2021 Original published format: FR 2107042 | [2023/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4113081 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01K1/08, G01K13/00 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G01K1/08 (EP);
G01K13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] |
Former [2023/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM MESSEN DER TEMPERATUR EINER OBERFLÄCHE EINES OBJEKTS BEI DER DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG, ENTSPRECHENDE ANORDNUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDES WÄRMEBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/01] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR MEASURING THE TEMPERATURE OF A SURFACE OF AN OBJECT DURING THE PERFORMANCE OF A HEAT TREATMENT, ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR HEAT TREATMENT | [2023/01] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MESURE DE LA TEMPÉRATURE D'UNE SURFACE D'UN OBJET LORS DE LA RÉALISATION D'UN TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE, ENSEMBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE | [2023/01] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 16.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0399061 (HELLIGE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * figures 1-2 ** the whole document *; | [XI]US2012024833 (KLEWER JASPER [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-12,14-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0006] , [0033] , [0036] , [0037] * * page 1; figure 1 * [I] 3-6,9,13,17-20 |