EP4124226 - WORK MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2023/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinney, Colter W. Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Soto, Carlos Albert Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Wackerle, Bradley A. Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Maro, Randall A. Mannheim / DE | [2023/05] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Christian John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Mannheim Regional Center Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2023/05] | Application number, filing date | 22182122.6 | 30.06.2022 | [2023/05] | Priority number, date | US202117388194 | 29.07.2021 Original published format: US202117388194 | [2023/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4124226 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01C5/06, A01C7/06, A01C7/20 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
A01C5/064 (EP,US);
A01C7/203 (EP,US);
A01C15/001 (US);
A01C7/06 (EP);
A01C7/201 (EP);
A01C7/205 (EP);
A01C15/005 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] |
Former [2023/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2023/05] | English: | WORK MACHINE | [2023/05] | French: | MACHINE DE TRAVAIL | [2023/05] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 01.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US7261048 (HANTKE GLENN [CA]) [X] 1,9-13 * paragraphs [0017] - [0033]; figures 1,2,7 * [A] 8 [Y] 2-7; | [YA]US2017215334 (DIENST JOHNATHON R [US], et al) [Y] 2-7 * column 8, line 59 - column 9; figures 1-3,10 *[A] 8 |