EP4119520 - LEVELLING MORTAR WITH SEALING FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fels-Werke GmbH Geheimrat-Ebert-Strasse 12 38640 Goslar / DE | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freund, Joachim Plockhorst / DE | 02 /
Dr. Boenkendorf, Ulf Holle / DE | 03 /
Rudolph, Martina Niemegk / DE | 04 /
Heße, Markus Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
Schinkel, Torsten Hannover / DE | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 22183744.6 | 08.07.2022 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | DE202110117771 | 09.07.2021 Original published format: DE102021117771 | [2023/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4119520 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02, C04B28/04, C04B28/06, C04B28/08, // C04B111/27, C04B111/60, C04B111/20 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B28/021 (EP);
C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B28/06 (EP);
C04B28/065 (EP);
C04B28/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/021, C04B12/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/104, C04B14/12, C04B14/185, C04B14/24, C04B18/141, C04B20/0076, C04B20/008, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2682, C04B24/383, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/0057, C04B2103/12, C04B2103/302, C04B2103/34, C04B2103/44, C04B2103/50, C04B2103/65 (EP);
C04B28/02, C04B12/04, C04B14/104, C04B14/12, C04B14/18, C04B14/24, C04B14/28, C04B20/0076, C04B20/008, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2682, C04B24/383, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/0057, C04B2103/0088, C04B2103/12, C04B2103/302, C04B2103/34, C04B2103/44, C04B2103/50, C04B2103/65 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B12/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/104, C04B14/12, C04B14/185, C04B14/24, C04B18/141, C04B20/0076, C04B20/008, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2682, C04B24/383, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/0057, C04B2103/12, C04B2103/302, C04B2103/34, C04B2103/44, C04B2103/50, C04B2103/65 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B12/04, C04B14/104, C04B14/12, C04B14/185, C04B14/24, C04B14/28, C04B18/265, C04B20/0076, C04B20/008, C04B22/062, C04B24/04, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2682, C04B24/383, C04B24/383, C04B24/42, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/0057, C04B2103/0088, C04B2103/34, C04B2103/50 (EP);
C04B28/065, C04B12/04, C04B14/104, C04B14/12, C04B14/185, C04B14/24, C04B14/28, C04B18/265, C04B20/0076, C04B20/008, C04B22/062, C04B24/04, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2682, C04B24/383, C04B24/383, C04B24/42, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/0057, C04B2103/0088, C04B2103/34, C04B2103/50 (EP);
C04B28/06, C04B12/04, C04B14/104, C04B14/12, C04B14/185, C04B14/24, C04B14/28, C04B18/265, C04B20/0076, C04B20/008, C04B22/062, C04B24/04, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2682, C04B24/383, C04B24/383, C04B24/42, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/0057, C04B2103/0088, C04B2103/34, C04B2103/50 (EP);
C04B28/08, C04B12/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/104, C04B14/12, C04B14/185, C04B14/24, C04B18/141, C04B20/0076, C04B20/008, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2682, C04B24/383, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/0057, C04B2103/12, C04B2103/302, C04B2103/34, C04B2103/44, C04B2103/50, C04B2103/65 (EP)
(-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KIMMSCHICHTMÖRTEL MIT ABDICHTFUNKTION | [2023/03] | English: | LEVELLING MORTAR WITH SEALING FUNCTION | [2023/03] | French: | MORTIER DE COUCHE D'ÉGALISATION À FONCTION D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 11.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0427064 (KNAUF WESTDEUTSCHE GIPS [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4 - page 5; examples 1,3,8 *; | [A]WO9706120 (STRACKE MARKUS [AT], et al) [A] 1* claims 1-2 *; | [A]DE19540273 (DENNERT PORAVER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5; example 4; table 1 *; | [A]EP0893554 (TUBAG TRASS ZEMENT STEIN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 28 * * page 5, line 56 - page 6, line 24; example 1 * * claim 20 *; | [A]EP1008568 (MAXIT HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0016] , [0029]; figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]DE102004030921 (FELS WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0020] , [0026] , [0027] , [0030] - [0032] - [0046] *; | [A]DE202011050860U (SAKRET GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021]; example 1 *; | [A]DE102013200122 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0091] *; | [XP]EP3932888 (SAINT GOBAIN WEBER FRANCE [FR]) [XP] 1,3,5-7,11 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0053]; table 1 * | by applicant | DE1951171 | DE29924111U | DE10113978 | DE10313937 | DE102004026610 | DE202011050860U | WO2019096760 | - MÜLLER, A., "Das Sulfatproblem", RECYCLING magazin, (20120000), vol. 22, pages 26 - 29 |