EP4303177 - MOLTEN METAL CATALYSED PYROLYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22183986.3 | 08.07.2022 | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4303177 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/38 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
C01B3/38 (EP);
C01B2203/0238 (EP);
C01B2203/1241 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSIERTE PYROLYSE VON GESCHMOLZENEM METALL | [2024/02] | English: | MOLTEN METAL CATALYSED PYROLYSIS | [2024/02] | French: | PYROLYSE CATALYSÉE PAR MÉTAL FONDU | [2024/02] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2020283293 (MCFARLAND ERIC W [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0025] , [0036] , [0037]; figures 4,15,16 * * paragraphs [0076] , [0084] * * paragraphs [0111] - [0113] * * paragraph [0115] * * examples 6,7,9 * * paragraphs [0144] , [0145] *[I] 2-14; | [XAI] - LE SACHÉ E ET AL, "Analysis of Dry Reforming as direct route for gas phase CO2 conversion. The past, the present and future of catalytic DRM technologies", PROGRESS IN ENERGY AND COMBUSTION SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 89, doi:10.1016/J.PECS.2021.100970, ISSN 0360-1285, (20211213), (20211213), XP086905620 [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * Section 7.6;; figure 17 * [A] 4,8,11-14 [I] 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pecs.2021.100970 | [XAI] - YANG QINGHAI ET AL, "Methane dry reforming in a coking- and sintering-free liquid alloy-salt catalytic system", SUSTAINABLE ENERGY & FUELS, (20200101), vol. 4, no. 6, doi:10.1039/D0SE00433B, pages 2768 - 2774, XP093012272 [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * abstract * * page 2769, column l, paragraph l - column r, line 13; figure 1 * * Experimental section - Bubble column reactors * [A] 4,8,11-14 [I] 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/D0SE00433B | by applicant | EP0655084 | US6110239 | US8309049 | WO2019226416 | WO2020161192 | US2020283293 | - KANG et al., ACS Catal., (20200000), vol. 10, no. 13, pages 7032 - 7042 | - RAHIMI et al., Carbon, (20190000), vol. 151, pages 181 - 191 | - ADACHI et al., J. Nucl. Sci. Technol., (19880000), vol. 25, no. 9, pages 712 - 720 |