EP4306148 - DOSE SETTING MECHANISM AND METHOD OF LOCKING AN INJECTION PEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states medmix Switzerland AG Rütistrasse 7 9469 Haag (Rheintal) / CH | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOCHT, Kenneth Allen Needham, 02492 / US | 02 /
COSTELLO, Peter Calvin Raynham, 02767 / US | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22184328.7 | 12.07.2022 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4306148 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20, A61M5/315, A61M5/50, A61M5/24 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A61M5/24 (EP);
A61M5/2422 (EP);
A61M5/2448 (EP);
A61M5/31551 (EP);
A61M5/3158 (EP);
A61M5/31591 (EP);
A61M5/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOSISEINSTELLMECHANISMUS UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERRIEGELN EINES INJEKTIONSSTIFTES | [2024/03] | English: | DOSE SETTING MECHANISM AND METHOD OF LOCKING AN INJECTION PEN | [2024/03] | French: | MÉCANISME DE RÉGLAGE DE DOSE ET PROCÉDÉ DE VERROUILLAGE D'UN STYLO D'INJECTION | [2024/03] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1066847 (NIHON CHEMICAL RES CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2020164150 (SMITH CHRISTOPHER JAMES [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14-17 * * paragraphs [0078] - [0164] *; | [A]US2020289762 (KEITEL JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |