EP4119967 - POWER STAGE COMPRISING A CONTROL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Electrical & Power 1 Rue Louis Blériot 31700 Blagnac / FR | [2024/33] |
Former [2023/03] | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles - Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABDESSELAM, Francis 78400 Chatou / FR | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/03] | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 22184533.2 | 12.07.2022 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | FR20210007579 | 13.07.2021 Original published format: FR 2107579 | [2023/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4119967 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/62, G01R31/27 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
G01R31/62 (EP);
H03K17/082 (US);
G01R19/16571 (US);
G01R31/27 (EP,US);
G01R31/52 (EP,US);
H02M1/08 (EP);
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02M3/335 (EP);
H03K17/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSTUFE UMFASSEND EINE STEUERUNGSEINHEIT | [2023/03] | English: | POWER STAGE COMPRISING A CONTROL UNIT | [2023/03] | French: | ETAGE DE PUISSANCE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 18.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4685020 (DRISCOLL CARLETON D [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 7, line 20 - line 37 *; | [I]US5900683 (RINEHART LAWRENCE EDWARD [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 61; figures 1,5; claims 13-14 * * column 3, line 17 - line 25 * * column 5, line 35 - line 49 *; | [A]EP2961067 (DELTA ELECTRONICS SHANGHAI CO [CN]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044]; figure 6 *; | [A]FR3077912 (SAFRAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-14* figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP3621192 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA AG [AT]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0045]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2020169179 (HARA HIDEO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0153]; figures 1,13 * |