EP4144940 - LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABUS August Bremicker Söhne KG Altenhofer Weg 25 58300 Wetter-Volmarstein / DE | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 22185026.6 | 14.07.2022 | [2023/10] | Priority number, date | DE202110122786 | 02.09.2021 Original published format: DE102021122786 | [2023/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4144940 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4144940 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05B1/00, E05B47/00, E05B55/06, E05B71/00, B62H5/00, B62J43/13, B62M6/90 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
E05B1/0038 (EP,US);
E05B71/00 (EP,US);
B62H5/001 (EP);
E05B47/0001 (EP);
E05B55/06 (EP);
B62J43/13 (EP);
E05B2047/0069 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] |
Former [2023/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLOSS | [2023/10] | English: | LOCK | [2023/10] | French: | SERRURE | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]AT349929B (SCHUERMANN HUGO [AT]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 8; figures 1, 2 * [A] 3,7,13 [I] 11,12; | [XI]DE102008014488 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,4,9-11 * paragraphs [0024] - [0030]; figures 1-4 * [I] 12; | [A]EP3130729 (TRELOCK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US9784017 (HUANG TSUNG-YU [TW]) [A] 1,12 * figure 5 *; | [A]US2018298640 (CATERINO MARK [US]) [A] 14,15* paragraphs [0049] - [0051]; figures 1-20 *; | [XI]DE102019113163 (BREMICKER SOEHNE KG A [DE]) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0060] , [ 0061]; figure 1 * [I] 15; | [XAI]DE202019005536U (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023]; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-13 [I] 15; | [XI]CN113027237 (BEIJING QISHENG TECH CO LTD) [X] 14 * figures 1-7 * [I] 15 |