EP4119753 - CONCEALED DOOR HINGE WITH SHIFTING PIVOT POINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | Deletion: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B/E Aerospace, Inc. 150 Oak Plaza Blvd. Winston-Salem, NC 27105 / US | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWRENCE, Robert J. King, NC 27021 / US | [2024/26] |
Former [2023/03] | 01 /
LAWRENCE, Robert J. King, NC / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 22185260.1 | 15.07.2022 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | US202117378160 | 16.07.2021 Original published format: US202117378160 | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4119753 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4119753 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E05D3/02, E05D5/04, E05F1/12, E05F1/14, B64C1/14, E05D3/18, E05D7/081 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
E05F1/14 (EP);
E05D11/1064 (US);
B64C1/1407 (EP);
E05D13/1207 (US);
E05D3/022 (US);
E05D3/14 (US);
E05D3/18 (EP,US);
E05D5/046 (EP);
E05D7/081 (EP);
E05F1/1253 (US);
E05F1/1269 (EP);
E05Y2201/246 (EP);
E05Y2201/41 (EP);
E05Y2201/422 (EP);
E05Y2201/462 (EP);
E05Y2201/654 (EP);
E05Y2201/68 (EP);
E05Y2900/20 (EP);
E05Y2900/502 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERDECKTES TÜRSCHARNIER MIT VERSCHIEBBAREM SCHWENKPUNKT | [2023/03] | English: | CONCEALED DOOR HINGE WITH SHIFTING PIVOT POINT | [2023/03] | French: | CHARNIÈRE DE PORTE DISSIMULÉE À POINT DE PIVOT MOBILE | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 17.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE10258684 (ASECOS GMBH SICHERHEIT UND UMW [DE]); | [Y]CN111616523 (JIAXING HUIZHAI HOUSEHOLD CO LTD); | [A]EP3760822 (GULFSTREAM AEROSPACE CORP [US]); | [A]CN112922475 (SHENZHEN XUANBAIHAN TRADE CO LTD) |