EP4307740 - APPARATUS, DEVICE, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knott, Thorsten 83104 Tuntenhausen / DE | 02 /
Ruester, Christoph 85774 Unterföhring / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22185266.8 | 15.07.2022 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4307740 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/0433, H04W12/0431, H04W12/082, H04W12/084, H04W4/40 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H04W12/0433 (EP);
H04L9/0838 (EP);
H04L9/0861 (EP);
H04W12/0431 (EP);
H04W12/084 (EP);
H04L2209/80 (EP);
H04L2209/84 (EP);
H04W12/082 (EP);
H04W12/47 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] |
Former [2024/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT, VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2024/03] | English: | APPARATUS, DEVICE, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2024/03] | French: | APPAREIL, DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2024/03] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 24.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017104589 (LAMBERT ROBERT JOHN [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074] ** figure 6 *; | [X]WO2018160863 (APPLE INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0102] * * figures 1C, 2, 5 *; | [X]WO2019241047 (APPLE INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0066] * * figures 4-8,13 *; | [X]US2022131685 (LIM TAEHYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0084] * * figures 3,4,17,18 * |