EP4148658 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SUPER-RESOLUTION RECONSTRUCTION OF HETEROGENEOUS STEREOSCOPIC IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guodian Nanjing Automation Co., LTD. No.38, New Model Road Gulou District 210009 Nanjing City Jiangsu / CN | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bing, Fan Nanjing City, Jiangsu Province / CN | 02 /
Peng, Li Nanjing City, Jiangsu Province / CN | 03 /
Shu, Jin Nanjing City, Jiangsu Province / CN | 04 /
Yuanyuan, Wang Nanjing City, Jiangsu Province / CN | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 22185424.3 | 18.07.2022 | [2023/11] | Priority number, date | CN202110855912 | 28.07.2021 Original published format: CN202110855912 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4148658 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
G06T3/4061 (EP);
G06T3/4053 (CN);
G06T5/70 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SUPERAUFLÖSUNGS-REKONSTRUKTION VON HETEROGENEN STEREOSKOPISCHEN BILDERN | [2023/11] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SUPER-RESOLUTION RECONSTRUCTION OF HETEROGENEOUS STEREOSCOPIC IMAGES | [2023/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RECONSTRUCTION EN SUPER-RÉSOLUTION D'IMAGES STÉRÉOSCOPIQUES HÉTÉROGÈNES | [2023/11] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 28.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2019392555 (KWAN CHIMAN [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0061]; figures 14-19 *; | [Y] - ZHENGDONG ZHANG ET AL, "FAST: Free Adaptive Super-Resolution via Transfer for Compressed Videos", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20160329), XP080688976 [Y] 1-10 * section 3.2;; figure 3 * | [A] - MITRA BASU, "Gaussian-Based Edge-Detection Methods-A Survey", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS: PART C:APPLICATIONS AND REVIEWS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20020801), vol. 32, no. 3, ISSN 1094-6977, XP011080053 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - HYUNWOO KIM ET AL, "Edge-enhancing super-resolution using anisotropic diffusion", PROCEEDINGS 2001 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP 2001 - THESSALONIKI, GREECE, OCT. 7 - 10, 2001; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING], INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, NEW YORK, NY, (20011007), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/ICIP.2001.958068, ISBN 978-0-7803-6725-8, pages 130 - 133, XP010563300 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2001.958068 | [A] - KAMAL NASROLLAHI ET AL, "Super-resolution: a comprehensive survey", MACHINE VISION AND APPLICATIONS, (20140801), vol. 25, no. 6, doi:10.1007/s00138-014-0623-4, ISSN 0932-8092, pages 1423 - 1468, XP055193477 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00138-014-0623-4 | [A] - CHEN KUO ET AL, "Fast image super-resolution for a dual-resolution camera", OPTICAL REVIEW., JP, vol. 22, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s10043-015-0077-6, ISSN 1340-6000, (20150402), pages 434 - 442, URL: http://link.springer.com/article/10.1007/s10043-015-0077-6/fulltext.html, XP093018621 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10043-015-0077-6 |