EP4311164 - METHOD FOR PROTECTING PAYLOAD DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states u-blox AG Zuercherstrasse 68 8800 Thalwil / CH | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenzarini, Davide 8800 Thalwil / CH | 02 /
La Manna, Michele 56126 Pisa / IT | 03 /
Vallati, Carlo 56126 Pisa / IT | 04 /
Xefraj, Riccardo 56126 Pisa / IT | 05 /
Perazzo, Pericle 56126 Pisa / IT | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22186471.3 | 22.07.2022 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4311164 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/30 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H04L9/3073 (EP);
H04L9/0825 (CN);
H04L9/0869 (US);
H04B7/18513 (CN);
H04L9/30 (US);
H04W12/0431 (CN);
H04L2209/601 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ VON NUTZLASTDATEN | [2024/04] | English: | METHOD FOR PROTECTING PAYLOAD DATA | [2024/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION DE DONNÉES DE CHARGE UTILE | [2024/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010228972 (WAT YIU-WING [HK], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0044] - [0050] *; | [I]US2013083924 (WEI VICTOR KEH WEI [HK], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0018] - [0024] *; | [I]CN106992871 (ENGINEERING UNIV OF THE CHINESE PEOPLE'S ARMED POLICE FORCE) [I] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] - [0071] *; | [I]US10212142 (DEARLOVE CHRISTOPHER MARK [GB], et al) [I] 1-17* column 11, paragraphs 14-49 *; | [I] - ARISA FUJII ET AL, "Secure Broadcast System with Simultaneous Individual Messaging", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS,COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, ENGINEERING SCIENCES SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, vol. E94A, no. 6, doi:10.1587/TRANSFUN.E94.A.1328, ISSN 0916-8508, (20110601), pages 1328 - 1337, (20110601), XP001569229 [I] 1-17 * section 4.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1587/transfun.E94.A.1328 |