EP4174178 - MULTIPLE EXON SKIPPING COMPOSITIONS FOR DMD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarepta Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAZANI, Peter Bothell, 98011 / US | 02 /
KOLE, Ryszard Cambridge, 02142 / US | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/18] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 22186770.8 | 23.10.2009 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | US20080108416P | 24.10.2008 Original published format: US 108416 P | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174178 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, C12N15/11, // A61P21/04 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61P21/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P21/04 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N15/111 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/321 (IL,US);
C12N2310/3233 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/331 (IL,US);
C12N2310/3341 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/3513 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/3533 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/11, C12N2310/3233, C12N2310/3513, C12N2320/33 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] |
Former [2023/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRERE EXON-SKIPPING-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DMD | [2023/18] | English: | MULTIPLE EXON SKIPPING COMPOSITIONS FOR DMD | [2023/18] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE SAUT D'EXON MULTIPLES POUR DMD | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 23.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 18.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09752572.9 / EP2350281 | EP14157806.2 / EP2762567 | EP16172354.9 / EP3133160 | EP18187962.8 / EP3428278 | EP21155461.3 / EP3875587 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006000057 (UNIV WESTERN AUSTRALIA [AU], et al) | by applicant | US3420788 | US3426011 | US3453259 | US3453257 | US3459731 | US4235871 | US4737323 | US5034506 | US5134127 | US5142047 | US5166315 | US5185444 | US5217866 | WO9402595 | US5506337 | WO9610391 | WO9610390 | WO9610392 | WO9614057 | US5521063 | US5627274 | US5665593 | US5698685 | US5916808 | US5976879 | US6210892 | US6692911 | WO2004083446 | WO2006000057 | US7070807 | US7163695 | WO2007058894 | WO2007US11435 | US20080233507 |