EP4312453 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR CONFIGURATION OF A TIMING ADVANCE IN RADIO COMMUNICATION NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2024/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIVANESAN, Kathiravetpillai Portland OR, 97229 / US | 02 /
VANNITHAMBY, Rath Portland OR, 97229 / US | [2024/05] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2024/05] | Application number, filing date | 22186894.6 | 26.07.2022 | [2024/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4312453 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00, G06N20/00 | [2024/05] | CPC: |
H04W56/0045 (EP);
G06N3/008 (EP);
G06N3/0442 (EP);
G06N3/092 (EP);
G06N3/0464 (EP);
G06N3/0475 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/36] |
Former [2024/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ZEITVORLAUFSKONFIGURATION IN FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZEN | [2024/05] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR CONFIGURATION OF A TIMING ADVANCE IN RADIO COMMUNICATION NETWORKS | [2024/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS POUR LA CONFIGURATION D'UNE AVANCE DE SYNCHRONISATION DANS DES RÉSEAUX DE COMMUNICATION RADIO | [2024/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/36] | 31.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2021235407 (ZHANG XIAOXIA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,13-15 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0093] * [A] 3,4,7,9-12; | [A]WO2021215995 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 20 ** page 28, line 10 - line 31 *; | [A]WO2022146594 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0100] * |