EP4134143 - INTERACTIVE ANIMATED CHARACTER HEAD SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal City Studios LLC 100 Universal City Plaza Universal City, CA 91608 / US | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VYAS, Anisha Orlando, 32819 / US | 02 /
COSSAIRT, Travis Jon 32819, Orlando / US | 03 /
YEH, Wei Cheng Orlando, 32819 / US | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Keltie LLP No. 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 22187082.7 | 06.02.2019 | [2023/07] | Priority number, date | US201815939887 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: US201815939887 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4134143 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4134143 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/216, A63F13/24, A63F13/28, A63F13/428, A63F13/67, A63F13/79, A63F13/95, A63G31/00, A63H13/00 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
A63F13/216 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/67 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04847 (KR,US);
A63F13/24 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/28 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/428 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/79 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/95 (EP,KR,US);
A63G31/00 (EP,KR,US);
A63H13/005 (EP,KR,US);
A63J19/006 (US);
G06F3/013 (KR,US);
G06K19/0723 (KR,US);
G06K7/10366 (KR,US);
G08C17/02 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] |
Former [2023/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR INTERAKTIVE ANIMIERTE FIGUREN-KÖPFE | [2024/02] | English: | INTERACTIVE ANIMATED CHARACTER HEAD SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2023/07] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ANIMATION INTERACTIVE DE TÊTES DE PERSONNAGES | [2023/07] |
Former [2023/07] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR KÖPFE INTERAKTIVER ANIMIERTER FIGUREN | Examination procedure | 14.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 14.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19707179.8 / EP3773951 | Divisional application(s) | EP24171122.5 / EP4374945 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009069935 (WIELAND ALEXIS PAUL [US]); | [A]US2013073087 (IRMLER HOLGER [US], et al); | [A]US2013226588 (IRMLER HOLGER [US], et al); | [A]WO2016033218 (UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC [US], et al); | [A]US2016316324 (SAHADI SCOTT SEBASTIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2017169449 (HEAVEN EDWIN MICHAEL GYDE [CA], et al); | [A]US2017270734 (GERAGHTY THOMAS [US], et al) |