EP4148215 - ELECTRONIC KEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cogelec 370 Rue de Maunit 85290 Mortagne-sur-Sèvre / FR | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECLERC, Roger 85130 LES LANDES GENUSSON / FR | 02 /
DUPE, Florian 49300 CHOLET / FR | 03 /
MARCHAL, Norbert 49300 CHOLET / FR | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | INNOV-GROUP 310, avenue Berthelot 69372 Lyon Cedex 08 / FR | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 22187708.7 | 29.07.2022 | [2023/11] | Priority number, date | FR20210009474 | 09.09.2021 Original published format: FR 2109474 | [2023/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4148215 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4148215 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/06, E05B19/00, E05B47/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
E05B47/0623 (EP);
E05B2047/0062 (EP);
E05B2047/0063 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/11] | E05B47/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2023/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHER SCHLÜSSEL | [2023/11] | English: | ELECTRONIC KEY | [2023/11] | French: | CLEF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/11] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 27.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 06.12.2023 | |
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2009261598 (POLLABAUER REINHARD [AT]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP3431684 (COGELEC [FR]) [AD] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]EP3477026 (COGELEC [FR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2101057 | EP1039074 | WO0065180 | EP1808816 | US2009261598 | EP2765264 | FR3025236 | DE202017103124U | EP3431684 | EP3477026 |