EP4130472 - ECONOMIZER INJECTION IN A RECIPROCATING COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 11.08.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | 11.08.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SISHTLA, Vishnu M. Syracuse, 13221 / US | 02 /
ALEMIC, Emir Syracuse, 13221 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 22188169.1 | 01.08.2022 | [2023/06] | Priority number, date | US202163229250P | 04.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163229250 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4130472 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F04B25/00, F04B27/04, F04B39/12, F04B49/06, F04B53/10, F04B39/06, // F04B35/04 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
F04B25/00 (EP);
F25B1/10 (US);
F04B25/04 (US);
F04B27/0404 (EP);
F04B39/0016 (US);
F04B39/062 (EP);
F04B39/122 (US);
F04B39/123 (EP,US);
F04B39/125 (EP);
F04B49/065 (EP);
F04B49/22 (US);
F04B53/1082 (EP);
F04B2201/0201 (EP);
F04B2205/03 (EP);
F04B2205/07 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] |
Former [2023/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ECONOMIZER-EINSPRITZUNG IN EINEM HUBKOLBENVERDICHTER | [2023/06] | English: | ECONOMIZER INJECTION IN A RECIPROCATING COMPRESSOR | [2023/06] | French: | INJECTION D'ÉCONOMISEUR DANS UN COMPRESSEUR ALTERNATIF | [2023/06] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 04.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB260984 (SOCIÉTÉ TECHNIQUE D'ETUDES ET D'ENTREPRISES POUR L'INDUSTRIE) [X] 7-10 * figures 1-11 * * page 1, line 100 - page 3, line 103 * [A] 1-6,12-15 [I] 11; | [XAI]US2772831 (COTTER GEORGE L) [X] 1-3,7 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 38 - column 3, line 67 * [A] 8-15 [I] 4-6; | [XAI]US4297083 (VON PETERY CURT) [X] 12 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 3 - line 50 * [A] 1-11 [I] 13-15; | [A]WO9918353 (KOPKO WILLIAM LESLIE [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * page 3, line 15 - page 6, line 5 *; | [A]US2008148764 (CAO YIDING [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-17 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0062] *; | [A]US2014202187 (CUR NIHAT O [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 15-16 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] *; | [A]WO2016182998 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 7, 10 ** paragraph [0037] *; | [A]US2018180041 (PEREIRA EVANDRO LUIZ LANGE [BR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0055] * |