EP4317859 - REFRIGERANT MODULE FOR THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOTA, Lohith Sriram Pavan 600130 Chennai / IN | 02 /
FIENE, Andreas 96476 Bad Rodach / DE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Service Propriété Intellectuelle 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22188176.6 | 01.08.2022 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317859 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/40, B60H1/00, B60H1/32, B60H1/22 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
F25B41/40 (EP);
B60H1/00485 (EP);
B60H1/00571 (EP);
B60H1/3229 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2024/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄLTEMITTELMODUL FÜR EIN THERMISCHES MANAGEMENTSYSTEM | [2024/06] | English: | REFRIGERANT MODULE FOR THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2024/06] | French: | MODULE RÉFRIGÉRANT POUR SYSTÈME DE GESTION THERMIQUE | [2024/06] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/35] | 19.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR20130134760 (DOOWON TECHNICAL COLLEGE [KR], et al) [Y] 11-14* figure 4 *; | [XYI]US2019039440 (CALDERONE JOHN DAVID [US]) [X] 1-4,15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0061]; figures 5,10,11 * [Y] 5,11,12,14 [I] 5; | [XYI]CN112428773 (SANHUA HOLDING GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,15 * Section "Technical Field";; figures 1, 4-6 * [Y] 5,11-14 [I] 9; | [X]WO2021048095 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE SE & CO KG WUERZBURG [DE]) [X] 1-4,15 * pages 1,17; figures 4-5, 7 * |