EP4130835 - OPTICAL LENS ASSEMBLY AND OPTICAL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Largan Precision Co. Ltd. No. 11, Jingke Rd. Nantun District Taichung City 408 / TW | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAN, Chen-Wei 408 Taichung City / TW | 02 /
CHOU, Ming-Ta 408 Taichung City / TW | 03 /
CHANG, Chien-Pang 408 Taichung City / TW | 04 /
LIN, Cheng-Fen 408 Taichung City / TW | 05 /
CHU, Kuo-Chiang 408 Taichung City / TW | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Jakelski & Althoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Mollenbachstraße 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 22188213.7 | 02.08.2022 | [2023/06] | Priority number, date | US202163228675P | 03.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163228675 P | TW20220116879 | 04.05.2022 Original published format: TW 111116879 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4130835 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/00, G02B1/118 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G02B1/118 (EP,US);
G02B1/113 (US);
G02B1/12 (US);
G02B13/006 (EP);
G02B13/0065 (EP);
G02B27/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE LINSENANORDNUNG UND OPTISCHES MODUL | [2023/06] | English: | OPTICAL LENS ASSEMBLY AND OPTICAL MODULE | [2023/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE LENTILLE OPTIQUE ET MODULE OPTIQUE | [2023/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 02.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006199040 (YAMADA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0011] , [0088] - [0093] - [0045] - [0048]; figures 1-4,12 * [I] 8-31; | [A]US2008310026 (NAKAYAMA TOMONARI [JP], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0049] - [0104]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2017315269 (OGANE MASANOBU [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0028] - [0043]; figure 1 *; | [T] - Ohara, "S-TIH53", (20221219), pages 1 - 1, URL: https://www.oharacorp.com/pdf/datasheets/S-TIH53-2020-06.pdf, (20221219), XP093009426 [T] * the whole document * |