EP4129248 - TIBIAL STABILIZATION AND PROTECTION ORTHOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortholabsport S.r.l. Corso San Gottardo 3 20136 Milano / IT | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUCHINI, Stefano Milano / IT | 02 /
CURTI, Giovanni Milano / IT | 03 /
MAGONI, Livio Milano / IT | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Zermani Biondi Orsi, Umberto Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 22188397.8 | 02.08.2022 | [2023/06] | Priority number, date | IT20210020705 | 02.08.2021 Original published format: IT202100020705 | [2023/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4129248 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4129248 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/058, A63B71/12 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
A61F5/0585 (EP);
A63B2071/1258 (EP);
A63B2071/1266 (EP);
A63B69/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] |
Former [2023/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STABILISIERUNGS- UND SCHUTZORTHESE FÜR DIE TIBIA | [2023/06] | English: | TIBIAL STABILIZATION AND PROTECTION ORTHOSIS | [2023/06] | French: | ORTHÈSE DE STABILISATION ET DE PROTECTION TIBIAL | [2023/06] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 28.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4420895 (BAUMANN PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-4 ** column 3, paragraphs 2, 3 *; | [XI]US6298484 (BECKMAN DAVID EDWARD [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, paragraph 2 * [I] 2-8; | [XI]US2015216703 (MADDEN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0038] , [0 60] , [0 64] * [I] 2-8 |