EP4310253 - SOUND BARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hatko Kaucuk Anonim Sirketi Suleymaniye Mah. Maresal Cakmak Cad. Park Apartmani Park Partmani 10 K Iskenderun Hatay / TR | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATKO, Nejan Hatay / TR | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Sevinç, Cenk Grup Ofis Marka Patent A.S. Atatürk Bulvari, 211/11 Kavaklidere 06680 Ankara / TR | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22188805.0 | 04.08.2022 | [2024/04] | Priority number, date | TR20220011688 | 22.07.2022 Original published format: TR 202211688 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310253 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E01F8/00, E01F8/02 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
E01F8/00 (EP);
E01F8/0029 (EP);
E01F8/007 (EP);
E01F8/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] |
Former [2024/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALLSCHUTZBARRIERE | [2024/04] | English: | SOUND BARRIER | [2024/04] | French: | BARRIÈRE ABSORBANT LE SON | [2024/04] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2374769 (BETONWERK SCHUSTER GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2015140584 (LAKUŠIĆ STJEPAN [HR], et al); | [XY]CN106801387 (POWERCHINA CHENGDU ENGINEERING CORP LTD); | [X]WO2018024263 (CZECH TECHNICAL UNIV IN PRAGUE [CZ]); | [XY]CZ35436U (INTERTECH PLUS S R O [CZ]) | by applicant | CN207159852U | CN210216199U |