EP4131181 - METHODS AND SYSTEM FOR PREDICTING TRAJECTORIES OF ACTORS WITH RESPECT TO A DRIVABLE AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 11.08.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | 11.08.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Argo AI, LLC 2545 Railroad St, Suite 400 Pittsburgh, PA 15222 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foil, Greydon Pittsburgh, 15222 / US | 02 /
Nichols, Gregory Boyd Pittsburgh, 15222 / US | 03 /
Metz, Alexander 80805 Munich / DE | 04 /
Schneemann, Friederike 80805 Munich / DE | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 22189042.9 | 05.08.2022 | [2023/06] | Priority number, date | US202117394853 | 05.08.2021 Original published format: US202117394853 | US202117394777 | 05.08.2021 Original published format: US202117394777 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4131181 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/58 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G06V20/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] |
Former [2023/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VORHERSAGE VON TRAJEKTORIEN VON AKTEUREN IN BEZUG AUF EINEN BEFAHRBAREN BEREICH | [2023/06] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEM FOR PREDICTING TRAJECTORIES OF ACTORS WITH RESPECT TO A DRIVABLE AREA | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈME POUR PRÉDIRE DES TRAJECTOIRES D'ACTEURS PAR RAPPORT À UNE ZONE CARROSSABLE | [2023/06] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 08.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016300485 (AYVACI ALPER [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0115]; figures 2-6 *; | [XI]US2019122037 (RUSSELL JARED STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-13 * figures 4-14 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0060] * [I] 4-9; | [I]US2020023842 (GUTIERREZ DAVID GOMEZ [MX], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0084]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]JP6760898B (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 8,9* paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0199]; figures 7-25 *; | [XI]WO2020198189 (ZOOX INC [US]) [X] 1-3,10-13 * figures 1-5,9-10 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0170] * [I] 4-9; | [I]WO2021062595 (BEIJING VOYAGER TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0074]; figures 1-5 *; | [I]WO2021134169 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *; | EP4074563 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0104]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | - CHANG et al., Argoverse: 3D tracking and Forecasting with Rich Maps, (20191106), URL: https://arxiv.org/abs/1911.02620 |