EP4155948 - METHODS AND APPARATUS TO SHARE MEMORY ACROSS DISTRIBUTED COHERENT EDGE COMPUTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUIM BERNAT, Francesc 08036 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
WILLHALM, Thomas 69207 Sandhausen / DE | 03 /
KUMAR, Karthik Chandler, 85249 / US | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 22189247.4 | 08.08.2022 | [2023/13] | Priority number, date | US202117485040 | 24.09.2021 Original published format: US202117485040 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4155948 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/0831, G06F12/0817, G06F13/16, G06F13/36, H04L67/1097 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
G06F13/36 (EP,US);
H04L67/1097 (EP,US);
G06F12/0828 (EP,US);
G06F12/0831 (EP);
G06F13/1668 (EP,US);
G06F2212/621 (US);
G06F2213/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] |
Former [2023/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEMEINSAMEN SPEICHERNUTZUNG ÜBER EIN VERTEILTES KOHÄRENTES RANDRECHNERSYSTEM HINWEG | [2023/13] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS TO SHARE MEMORY ACROSS DISTRIBUTED COHERENT EDGE COMPUTING SYSTEM | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR PARTAGER LA MÉMOIRE DANS UN SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE DISTRIBUÉ DE BORD COHÉRENT | [2023/13] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 21.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2021011864 (GUIM BERNAT FRANCESC [ES], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10,13-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1-8; claims 1-20 * [I] 3,4,11,12; | [XI]US2021149803 (BERNAT FRANCESC GUIM [ES]) [X] 1,5-9,13-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0076] * * figures 1-13 *[I] 2,3,10,11 |