EP4174586 - TIMEPIECE ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A WATCH AND A SYSTEM FOR CORRECTING THE TIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAVRE, Jérôme 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
BORN, Jean-Jacques 1110 Morges / CH | 03 /
IMBODEN, Matthias 2072 St-Blaise / CH | 04 /
NICOLAS, Cédric 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 22189339.9 | 08.08.2022 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | EP20210205505 | 29.10.2021 Original published format: EP 21205505 | [2023/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174586 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4174586 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G04D7/12, G04D7/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G04D7/1292 (EP);
G04B27/007 (CN);
G04C11/084 (US);
G04C3/06 (US);
G04D7/004 (EP);
G04D7/1264 (EP);
G04D7/1271 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | G04D7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] |
Former [2023/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UHRENEINHEIT, DIE EINE ARMBANDUHR UND EIN UHRZEITKORREKTURSYSTEM UMFASST | [2023/18] | English: | TIMEPIECE ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A WATCH AND A SYSTEM FOR CORRECTING THE TIME | [2023/18] | French: | ENSEMBLE HORLOGER COMPRENANT UNE MONTRE ET UN SYSTÈME DE CORRECTION DE L'HEURE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 03.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3252545 (SWATCH GROUP RES & DEV LTD [CH]); | [A]CH714264 (WINSTON HARRY SA [CH]); | [A]EP3584645 (SWATCH GROUP RES & DEV LTD [CH]); | [A]EP3620867 (SWATCH GROUP RES & DEV LTD [CH]) | by applicant | EP3629104 | WO2021121711 |