EP4152638 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HANDLING A REFERENCE SIGNAL REPORTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acer Incorporated 8F, 88, Sec. 1, Hsin Tai Wu Road Xizhi District New Taipei City 221 / TW | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lo, Li-Chung 221 New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Lee, Chien-Min 221 New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
Chen, Jen-Hsien 221 New Taipei City / TW | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/12] | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | Application number, filing date | 22189710.1 | 10.08.2022 | [2023/12] | Priority number, date | US202163245199P | 17.09.2021 Original published format: US 202163245199 P | US202217879783 | 03.08.2022 Original published format: US202217879783 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4152638 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04W76/25, H04W36/30 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (KR);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/0053 (KR);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04W24/08 (EP,KR);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
H04W72/1268 (KR);
H04W72/21 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] |
Former [2023/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG EINER REFERENZSIGNALMELDUNG | [2023/12] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HANDLING A REFERENCE SIGNAL REPORTING | [2023/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN RAPPORT DE SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE | [2023/12] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 30.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2021029755 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XI]US2021105176 (TSAI HSIN-HSI [TW], et al); | EP4016860 [ ] (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); |