EP4163305 - USE OF POLY ALPHA-1,3-GLUCAN ETHERS AS VISCOSITY MODIFIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.01.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nutrition & Biosciences USA 4, Inc. 3490 Winton Place Rochester NY 14623 / US | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASAT, Rahul B. Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | 02 /
PAULLIN, Jayme L. Claymont, Delaware 19703 / US | 03 /
PERTICONE, Andrea M. Clayton, Delaware 19938 / US | 04 /
DENNES, T. Joseph Parkesburg, Pennsylvania 19365 / US | 05 /
NAMBIAR, Rakesh West Chester, Pennsylvania 19382 / US | 06 /
COBB, Michael W. Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | [2023/51] |
Former [2023/15] | 01 /
KASAT, Rahul B. Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 22190123.4 | 15.12.2014 | [2023/15] | Priority number, date | US201361916360P | 16.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361916360 P | US201462014271P | 19.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462014271 P | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4163305 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4163305 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, C08L5/00 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
C08B37/0009 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/73 (US);
C08J3/02 (KR);
C08L5/00 (EP,KR,US);
C11D3/225 (US);
C12P19/04 (US);
D06L1/00 (US);
D06L1/12 (US);
A61K2800/48 (US);
A61Q11/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] |
Former [2023/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON POLY-ALPHA-1,3-GLUCAN-ETHERN ALS VISKOSITÄTSMODIFIKATOREN | [2023/15] | English: | USE OF POLY ALPHA-1,3-GLUCAN ETHERS AS VISCOSITY MODIFIERS | [2023/15] | French: | UTILISATION D'ÉTHERS POLY ALPHA-1,3-GLUCANE EN TANT QUE MODIFICATEURS DE LA VISCOSITÉ | [2023/15] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 28.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14822009.8 / EP3083704 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0819703 (MIBELLE AG COSMETICS [DE]); | [AD]WO2013036968 (DU PONT [US], et al); | [A]US2013157316 (CAIMI PERRY G [US], et al); | by applicant | GB1296839 | US3844890 | GB1372034 | EP0035478 | GB2095275 | US4435307 | US4462917 | US4464270 | US4477360 | US4580421 | EP0218272 | US4689297 | EP0258068 | EP0260105 | WO8809367 | US4794661 | US4799550 | EP0305216 | JPS6474992 | WO8906270 | EP0331376 | WO9009446 | EP0407225 | WO9100353 | WO9116422 | WO9205249 | WO9206221 | WO9206165 | WO9206154 | EP0495257 | WO9221760 | EP0531372 | EP0531315 | WO9324618 | WO9401541 | WO9402597 | WO9407998 | USRE34606E | WO9412621 | US5324649 | WO9418314 | US5340735 | WO9425578 | WO9501426 | WO9506720 | WO9510603 | WO9510602 | WO9514783 | WO9522615 | WO9523221 | WO9524471 | WO9526397 | US5457046 | WO9530744 | WO9535381 | WO9535382 | WO9600292 | WO9605295 | US5500364 | WO9611262 | WO9612012 | WO9613580 | WO9623874 | WO9623873 | WO9627002 | WO9629397 | WO9630481 | WO9703161 | WO9704079 | WO9707202 | WO9710342 | US5648263 | WO9741213 | US5686593 | WO9743424 | US5691178 | US5700676 | WO9808940 | WO9812307 | WO9815257 | US5763254 | WO9826078 | US5776757 | US5776435 | US5801039 | US5814501 | US5855625 | WO9902702 | WO9909183 | WO9914341 | WO9914342 | WO9919467 | WO9923211 | WO9929876 | WO9933960 | WO9934003 | WO9942567 | US5945394 | WO9943793 | WO9943794 | WO9946399 | US5955340 | WO0029560 | WO0060060 | WO0060058 | WO0060059 | CN1283633 | WO0114629 | WO0114532 | WO0134899 | WO0134784 | WO0164852 | WO0166712 | US6312936 | WO0185888 | WO0188107 | WO0196537 | WO0210355 | WO0231124 | US6440991 | US6482628 | WO02092797 | US6562612 | US6566114 | US6579840 | US6602842 | WO03089562 | US6730646 | WO2004113551 | WO2005001064 | WO2005003311 | WO2005018336 | WO2005019443 | WO2005056782 | WO2005056783 | WO2005066338 | US6933140 | WO2006007911 | WO2006012899 | WO2006012902 | US7000000 | US7001878 | US7012053 | WO2006031554 | WO2006045391 | US7056880 | WO2006063594 | WO2006066594 | WO2006066596 | US7138263 | WO2006136161 | WO2007044993 | EP1504994 | WO2007106293 | WO2008000825 | WO2008000567 | US2008090747 | WO2008063400 | WO2008088493 | WO2008087426 | WO2008092919 | WO2008101894 | WO2008106214 | WO2008106215 | WO2009058303 | WO2009058661 | WO2009061381 | US7534759 | WO2009100102 | WO2009098659 | WO2009098660 | US7576048 | US2009209445 | EP2100949 | WO2009112992 | US7595182 | WO2009124160 | US7604974 | WO2009140504 | WO2009149200 | WO2009149144 | WO2009149145 | WO2009149419 | WO2009152031 | US2010081598 | WO2010056640 | WO2010056653 | WO2010059413 | WO2010059483 | WO2010088447 | WO2010088112 | WO2010091221 | WO2010090915 | WO2010104675 | WO2010115021 | WO2010117511 | WO2010116139 | WO2010135238 | WO2011072099 | WO2011076123 | WO2011076897 | WO2011080352 | WO2011080353 | WO2011080354 | WO2011082425 | WO2011082429 | WO2011087836 | WO2011094687 | WO2011094690 | WO2011098531 | WO2011127102 | WO2011140364 | WO2011163428 | WO2012027404 | WO2012059336 | WO2012104613 | EP1740690 | WO2012151534 | US8530219 | US2013244288 | US2013244287 | US8541041 | US8540971 | US8569033 | US8575083 | US2014179913 |