EP4138073 - SOUND ABSORBING STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2023/08] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREXLER, Jason W. Chicago, 60606-1596 / US | 02 /
KAUFFMAN IV, Joseph Ulrich Chicago, 60606-1596 / US | 03 /
MONTGOMERY, Joshua M. Chicago, 60606-1596 / US | 04 /
WILDE, John Christopher Chicago, 60606-1596 / US | 05 /
NGUYEN, Phuong Minh Chicago, 60606-1596 / US | 06 /
METTING, Stephanie Iris Chicago, 60606-1596 / US | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 22190343.8 | 15.08.2022 | [2023/08] | Priority number, date | US202117445148 | 16.08.2021 Original published format: US202117445148 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4138073 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4138073 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/168, G10K11/172, B29C73/00, B29C73/04, B29C73/10, B32B3/12, B32B5/02, B32B5/26, B32B7/12, B32B15/04, B32B15/09, B32B15/10, B32B15/12, B32B15/14, B32B21/06, B32B21/08, B32B21/10, B32B27/10 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
G10K11/168 (EP,US);
B64C1/40 (EP,US);
B32B15/043 (EP);
B32B15/09 (EP);
B32B15/092 (EP);
B32B15/098 (EP);
B32B15/10 (EP);
B32B15/12 (EP);
B32B15/14 (EP);
B32B21/06 (EP);
B32B21/08 (EP);
B32B21/10 (EP);
B32B27/10 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/38 (EP);
B32B27/42 (EP);
B32B29/005 (EP);
B32B29/02 (EP);
B32B3/12 (EP,US);
B32B37/1284 (US);
B32B37/18 (US);
B32B38/0012 (US);
B32B38/10 (US);
B32B38/1866 (US);
B32B38/1875 (US);
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B5/026 (EP,US);
B32B5/028 (US);
B32B5/26 (US);
B32B5/2795 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B64C1/066 (EP);
B64D11/00 (EP);
B64D11/003 (EP);
G10K11/172 (EP);
B29C73/04 (EP);
B29C73/10 (EP);
B32B2038/0028 (US);
B32B2250/04 (US);
B32B2255/02 (EP);
B32B2260/021 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/0246 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/04 (EP);
B32B2262/062 (EP);
B32B2262/08 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | G10K11/168, G10K11/172, B29C73/00, B29C73/04, B29C73/10 | ||
Former IPC [2023/08] | G10K11/168, G10K11/172 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] |
Former [2023/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALLABSORBIERENDE STRUKTUREN | [2023/08] | English: | SOUND ABSORBING STRUCTURES | [2023/08] | French: | STRUCTURES D'ABSORPTION SONORE | [2023/08] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 26.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6267838 (SAUGNAC FREDERIC [FR], et al); | [XY]US2010247848 (HOETZELDT STEPHEN [DE], et al); | [Y]US8696843 (DEAN THOMAS ANDREW [US]); | [Y]US2014329043 (SHIGETOMI TOSHIKAZU [JP]); | [A]CN209580710U (KUNSHAN JIAHE COMPOSITE TEXTILE CO LTD); |