EP4324374 - HANDHELD VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osiniak, Mateusz 36-050 Sokolów Malopolski / PL | 02 /
Pluskwa, Karol 35-021 Rzeszów / PL | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22190877.5 | 17.08.2022 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4324374 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47L7/04, A47L11/40 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
A47L7/04 (EP);
A47L11/4038 (EP);
A47L11/408 (EP);
A47L5/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/39] |
Former [2024/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDSTAUBSAUGER | [2024/08] | English: | HANDHELD VACUUM CLEANER | [2024/08] | French: | ASPIRATEUR PORTATIF | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/39] | 21.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002083549 (DEITERMAN LENARD [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0081]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2009260177 (RICHARDS EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP2987445 (HOUSSEN CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP2987442 (RAYCOP KOREA INC [KR]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0039]; figure 7 *; | [AD]CN104207730B (ZHAO LIGUO) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE202016104251U (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0013]; figure - *; | [A]US2020029760 (SEO JONGHYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0167]; figure 3 * | by applicant | CN104207730 | DE202016104251U | US2020383547 |