EP4114124 - TWO-STEP RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE IN UNLICENSED BANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6 Yard 33, Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing / CN | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIRIK, Ali Cagatay 20190, Reston / US | 02 /
DINAN, Esmael Reston, 20190 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, Hua Reston, 20190 / US | 04 /
JEON, Hyoungsuk Reston, 20190 / US | 05 /
BABAEI, Alireza Reston, 20190 / US | 06 /
PARK, Kyungmin Reston, 20190 / US | 07 /
XU, Kai Reston, 20190 / US | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 22191352.8 | 03.01.2020 | [2023/01] | Priority number, date | US201962788612P | 04.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962788612 P | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4114124 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
H04W74/08 (EP);
H04W74/0833 (CN,KR);
H04W74/0841 (US);
H04W72/0453 (CN);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04W72/1268 (KR);
H04W72/23 (KR,US);
H04W74/004 (KR,US);
H04W74/02 (US);
H04W74/0816 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] |
Former [2023/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZWEISTUFIGES ZUFALLSZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN IN UNLIZENZIERTEN BÄNDERN | [2023/01] | English: | TWO-STEP RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE IN UNLICENSED BANDS | [2023/01] | French: | PROCÉDURE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE EN DEUX ÉTAPES DANS DES BANDES SANS LICENCE | [2023/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 04.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20702540.4 / EP3868169 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018324872 (BABAEI ALIREZA [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0194] - paragraph [0195] * * paragraph [0251] - paragraph [0253] *; | [A] - INTEL CORPORATION, "PRACH Transmission for eLAA", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-164131, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160514), XP051090085 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] * | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "Random access principles for new radio", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161104), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1612299_RANDOM ACCESS PRINCIPLES FOR NEW RADIO, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_87/Docs/, (20161104), XP051189268 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0003] * | by applicant | US2018324872 |