EP4140934 - DUAL SIDE ACTUATED SCISSOR FORK TYPE LIFT UNIT FOR LIFTING PLURALITY OF PAYLOADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANGALORE SRINIVAS, Venkatesh Prasad 560009 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 02 /
BHOGINENI, SREEHARI KUMAR 560009 Bangalore, Kamataka / IN | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 22191415.3 | 22.08.2022 | [2023/09] | Priority number, date | IN202121038654 | 26.08.2021 Original published format: IN202121038654 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4140934 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B66F7/06 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
B66F7/0666 (EP);
B66F9/20 (US);
B66F9/18 (US);
B66F9/19 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] |
Former [2023/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEIDSEITIG BETÄTIGTE SCHERENGABEL ZUM HEBEN EINER MEHRZAHL VON NUTZLASTEN | [2023/09] | English: | DUAL SIDE ACTUATED SCISSOR FORK TYPE LIFT UNIT FOR LIFTING PLURALITY OF PAYLOADS | [2023/09] | French: | UNITÉ DE LEVAGE DE TYPE CHARIOT ÉLÉVATEUR À FOURCHE À CISEAUX ACTIONNÉ DES DEUX CÔTÉS POUR SOULEVER PLUSIEURS CHARGES UTILES | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 31.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011253959 (STANIMIROVIC BRANIMIR [CA], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]GB2554902 (LEE DAVID SCREATON [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] *; | [A]CN110790184 (BEIJING XINGHANG MECH ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1 * figure 6A * |