EP4144562 - ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A BATTERY AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | 08.09.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Matthias Fabian 90403 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Lingen, Christian 91054 Erlangen / DE | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 22191463.3 | 22.08.2022 | [2023/10] | Priority number, date | DE202110209620 | 01.09.2021 Original published format: DE102021209620 | [2023/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144562 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/00, B60L58/18, H01M10/44, G01R31/382, H02J7/00 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
B60L3/0046 (EP);
B60L58/18 (EP);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/441 (EP);
H01M10/48 (EP);
H02J7/0069 (EP);
H02J7/34 (EP);
B60L2200/26 (EP);
B60L2210/10 (EP);
B60L2240/549 (EP);
B60L2240/80 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG MIT EINER BATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BATTERIE | [2023/10] | English: | ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A BATTERY AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A BATTERY | [2023/10] | French: | ENSEMBLE COMPRENANT UNE BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE BATTERIE | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 05.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7234552 (PREMA MUKUNDA V [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAI]US2012025755 (XU WENHUI [CN], et al) [X] 1,3-5,12-14 * abstract * * figures 1-11 * * columns 4-8, 32 * [A] 6,7 [I] 9-11; | [A]US2014084849 (LEE DONG-JOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XAI]US2014197802 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP]) [X] 1,2,14 * abstract * * claims 1-19 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] - [0055] , [0097] , [0148] - [0153] - [ 256] - [0266] - [ 290] - [0308] * [A] 6,7 [I] 3-5,9-13 |