EP4145658 - ASSEMBLY WITH BATTERY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hassler, Stefan 91281 Kirchenthumbach, OT Neuzirkendorf / DE | 02 /
Probst, Sebastian 90408 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 22191489.8 | 22.08.2022 | [2023/10] | Priority number, date | DE202110209613 | 01.09.2021 Original published format: DE102021209613 | [2023/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4145658 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4145658 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/10, H02J7/00 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H02J7/0013 (EP);
H02J1/106 (EP);
H02J7/0025 (EP);
H02J7/00304 (EP);
H02J7/00306 (EP);
H02J7/0063 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] |
Former [2023/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG MIT BATTERIESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB | [2023/10] | English: | ASSEMBLY WITH BATTERY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | [2023/10] | French: | AGENCEMENT DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 14.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6208039 (MENDELSOHN AARON J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 16; figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2004147477 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 36] , [0051] - [0058]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP2985857 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 11,13* paragraphs [0059] - [0065]; figures 1,4 *; | [XYI]DE102017002113 (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,12,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0018] , [0023] , [0 24] , [0034]; figure 1 * [Y] 8,9,11,13 [I] 5,10; | [A]DE102017002112 (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |