EP4140523 - CLOSED LOOP SMOKE FILTRATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLSTEN, Henry E. North Haven, 06473 / US | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | Application number, filing date | 22191692.7 | 23.08.2022 | [2023/09] | Priority number, date | US202163237357P | 26.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163237357 P | US202217863512 | 13.07.2022 Original published format: US202217863512 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4140523 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61M13/00, // A61B18/00, B01D46/00, B03C3/00, B03C3/017 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
A61M13/006 (EP,US);
B03C3/017 (EP);
B03C3/019 (EP);
B03C3/09 (EP);
B03C3/12 (US);
B03C3/155 (EP,US);
B03C3/32 (EP);
B03C3/41 (EP,US);
B03C3/47 (EP,US);
B03C3/60 (US);
A61B18/00 (EP);
A61B2218/008 (EP);
A61M2205/07 (US);
A61M2205/126 (US);
A61M2205/7509 (EP);
A61M2205/7518 (EP);
A61M2205/7545 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8206 (EP,US);
B03C2201/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUCHFILTRATIONSSYSTEM MIT GESCHLOSSENEM KREISLAUF | [2023/09] | English: | CLOSED LOOP SMOKE FILTRATION SYSTEM | [2023/09] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FILTRATION DE FUMÉE EN BOUCLE FERMÉE | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 25.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010094200 (DEAN ROBERT O [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially the figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2016287817 (MASTRI DOMINICK [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document, and especially the figures *; | [A]WO2017184876 (BUFFALO FILTER LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially paragraphs [0014]-[0026], the claims and the figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2018081587 (ZINNANTI WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially the figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE102017006185 (CAPNOMED GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially claim 6 and figure 2 *; | [I]WO2020087007 (BUFFALO FILTER LLC [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially the figures * | by applicant | US7300448 | US7691089 | US8926508 |