EP4167578 - MEDIA DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND MEDIA DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jonghwan 06772 Seoul / KR | 02 /
YOON, Joonhee 06772 Seoul / KR | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/16] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22191727.1 | 23.08.2022 | [2023/16] | Priority number, date | KR20210136049 | 13.10.2021 Original published format: KR 20210136049 | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4167578 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2362, H04N21/61, H04N21/858 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
H04N21/2362 (EP,KR);
H04N21/6112 (EP,KR);
H04N21/6118 (EP,KR);
H04N21/6125 (EP,KR);
H04N21/6143 (EP,KR);
H04N21/8586 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIENDATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND MEDIENDATENVERARBEITUNGSGERÄT | [2023/16] | English: | MEDIA DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND MEDIA DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2023/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES MULTIMÉDIA | [2023/16] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 17.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2021014541 (PARK JONGHWAN [KR], et al); | [A]EP3876544 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); |