EP4141952 - QUANTUM DEVICE INCLUDING A BURIED METAL ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment le Ponant 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEBOJEWSKI, Heimanu 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 Bis Esplanade de La Défense CS 60347 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 22191936.8 | 24.08.2022 | [2023/09] | Priority number, date | FR20210009068 | 31.08.2021 Original published format: FR 2109068 | [2023/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4141952 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/06, H01L29/40, H01L29/423, H01L29/66, G06N10/40, // B82Y10/00 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
H01L29/66439 (EP);
G06N10/40 (EP,US);
H01L29/0649 (EP);
H01L29/0673 (EP);
H01L29/401 (EP);
H01L29/423 (EP);
H01L29/66977 (EP);
B82Y10/00 (EP);
H01L29/66984 (EP);
H10N60/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | QUANTENVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER EINGEGRABENEN METALLISCHEN ELEKTRODE | [2023/09] | English: | QUANTUM DEVICE INCLUDING A BURIED METAL ELECTRODE | [2023/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF QUANTIQUE INTÉGRANT UNE ELECTRODE ENTERRÉE METALLIQUE | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 10.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2075745 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * Figures 1, 2, 11, 18 et texte correspondant. *; | [A]US2016300155 (BETZ ANDREAS [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * Figures 1-3, 6 et texte correspondant. *; | [A]US2019123183 (HUTIN LOUIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * Figures 1, 4, 5, 8 et texte correspondant. *; | [A]US10381468 (CHENG KANGGUO [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * Figures 3-8 et texte correspondant. *; | [A]US2020127096 (EENDEBAK PIETER THIJS [NL], et al) [A] 1-12* Figure 1 et texte correspondant. *; | [A] - THOMAS KANNE ET AL, "Double nanowires for hybrid quantum devices", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20210325), XP081916934 [A] 1-12 * Figure 1 et texte correspondant. * | [A] - HUTIN L ET AL, "SOI CMOS technology for quantum information processing", 2017 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IC DESIGN AND TECHNOLOGY (ICICDT), IEEE, (20170523), doi:10.1109/ICICDT.2017.7993523, pages 1 - 4, XP033131249 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICICDT.2017.7993523 |